DC B22-0574 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on January 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-19 - Enacted with Act Number A22-0590
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on January 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-19 - Enacted with Act Number A22-0590
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill establishes a Data Sharing and Paperwork Advisory Council to improve efficiencies in data collection, information sharing, and information resources management to serve as an advisory body to the Mayor, the Council, and District agencies.
FUNDING NOTE - This law is Subject to Appropriations. See Fiscal Impact Statement in "Other Documents" tab.
Title
District Of Columbia Paperwork Reduction And Data Collection Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-18 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-27 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-27 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-19 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0590 |
2019-01-03 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 18, 2019 |
2018-12-18 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-11-27 | Council | First Reading |
2018-11-16 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-11-14 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0574 |
2018-06-06 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-05-11 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-11-10 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0574 Published in the DC Register |
2017-11-07 | Council | Referred to Committee on Government Operations |
2017-11-07 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |