DC B22-0570 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-09 - Act A22-0501 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 12333
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, this bill establishes baseline rents for units that are no longer exempt from the District's rent stabilization program after a tenant-based subsidy has ended. The bill specifies that the new base rent will be based on the adjustments of general applicability issued during the period the unit was exempted. FUNDING NOTE - This law is Subject to Appropriations. See Fiscal Impact Statement in "Other Documents" tab.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rental Housing Affordability Re-establishment Amendment Act Of 2017

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-10-16 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-02 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-09CouncilAct A22-0501 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 12333
2018-10-31CouncilSigned with Act Number A22-0501
2018-10-31CouncilEnacted with Act Number A22-0501
2018-10-19CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on November 2, 2018
2018-10-16CouncilFinal Reading CC
2018-10-02CouncilFirst Reading CC
2018-09-26CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2018-09-24CouncilCommittee Mark-up of B22-0570
2017-12-18CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2017-12-01CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2017-11-10CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B22-0570 Published in the DC Register
2017-11-07CouncilReferred to Committee on Housing and Neighborhood Revitalization
2017-11-07CouncilIntroduced in Legislative Meeting

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback