DC B22-0558 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 3 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-12-18 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, this bill requires health care facilities to add community benefits - health improvement services and benefits that are provided without charge - as a prerequisite to obtaining or maintaining a certificate of need. The community benefits must be made specifically available to District residents.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Community Health Investment Amendment Act Of 2017

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-18CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2017-12-01CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2017-11-10CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B22-0558 Published in the DC Register
2017-11-07CouncilReferred to Committee on Health
2017-11-03CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback