DC B22-0549 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-15 - Act A22-0204, Expires on March 13, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 12559
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-15 - Act A22-0204, Expires on March 13, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 12559
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Department Of Health Care Finance Independent Procurement Authority Emergency Act Of 2017
Title
Department Of Health Care Finance Independent Procurement Authority Emergency Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-11-21 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-21 - Council - Amendments 1 thru 7 (Gray) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-21 - Council - Motion to Strike Amendment #4 (McDuffie) (Y: 5 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-11-21 - Council - Amendments 1 thru 7 (Gray) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-21 - Council - Motion to Strike Amendment #4 (McDuffie) (Y: 5 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-15 | Council | Act A22-0204, Expires on March 13, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 12559 |
2017-12-13 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0204 |
2017-11-28 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 12, 2017 |
2017-11-21 | Council | Motion to Strike Amendment #4 (McDuffie) |
2017-11-21 | Council | Final Reading |
2017-11-21 | Council | Amendments 1 thru 7 (Gray) |
2017-11-07 | Council | Not considered |
2017-11-07 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2017-11-02 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |