DC B22-0524 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on June 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-05 - Law Number L22-0111 Effective from June 5, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, this bill establishes the Maternal Mortality Review Committee within the Office of the Chief Medical Examiner to determine the causes associated with maternal deaths in the District and find solutions to lower the maternal death rate and improve maternal health. The Board is required to submit an annual report of findings, recommendation, and steps taken to evaluate implementation of recommendations, to the public, the Mayor, and the Council of the District of Columbia. It also gives the Committee the authority to seek information from entities and agencies inside and outside the District of Columbia including medical records.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maternal Mortality Review Committee Establishment Act Of 2017

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-06 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Council - Amendment (Allen) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-05CouncilLaw Number L22-0111 Effective from June 5, 2018
2018-04-23CouncilTransmitted to Congress
2018-04-20CouncilAct A22-0315 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 4278
2018-04-12CouncilEnacted with Act Number A22-0315
2018-03-28CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on April 11, 2018
2018-03-06CouncilFinal Reading CC
2018-02-06CouncilFirst Reading
2018-02-06CouncilAmendment (Allen)
2018-01-18CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2018-01-18CouncilCommittee Mark-up of B22-0524
2017-12-07CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2017-11-03CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2017-10-20CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B22-0524 Published in the DC Register
2017-10-17CouncilReferred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
2017-10-17CouncilIntroduced in Committee of the Whole

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback