DC B22-0511 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Law Number L22-0147 Effective from July 17, 2018, Projected Law Date is July 14, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Law Number L22-0147 Effective from July 17, 2018, Projected Law Date is July 14, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill establishes when a lifeguard is not required for a swimming pool. It also establishes when shower, toilet and dressing room facilities are not required at certain facilities and also establishes certain exemptions for pools at condominium and apartment buildings.
Title
Pools Without Penalties Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] | Cnc. Jack Evans [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-01 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Council - Amendment (Gray) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Council - Amendment (Gray) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-10 | Council | Law Number L22-0147 Effective from July 17, 2018, Projected Law Date is July 14, 2018 |
2018-06-04 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is July 14, 2018 |
2018-06-01 | Council | Act A22-0374 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 5988 |
2018-05-21 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0374 |
2018-05-21 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0374 |
2018-05-11 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on May 25, 2018 |
2018-05-01 | Council | Final Reading |
2018-05-01 | Council | Amendment (Gray) |
2018-04-10 | Council | First Reading CC |
2018-03-15 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-03-14 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0511 |
2017-11-28 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2017-10-20 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-10-06 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0511 Published in the DC Register |
2017-10-03 | Council | Referred to Committee on Health |
2017-10-03 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |