DC B22-0507 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on January 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-29 - Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is March 26, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on January 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-29 - Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is March 26, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill establishes and sets eligibility requirements and an application process for a lead waterline pipe replacement voucher program for income-eligible District residents, the Lead Pipe Replacement Voucher Program. The program, which is to be administered by WASA; requires owners who rent or sell properties in the District to disclose the presence of certain lead-pipe related conditions prior to purchase or lease of the unit; and requires the Mayor to submit reports to the Council on the implementation of various provisions of the bill.
FUNDING NOTE - This law is Subject to Appropriations. See Fiscal Impact Statement in "Other Documents" tab.
Title
Lead Pipe Replacement And Disclosure Amendment Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. Brandon Todd [D] |
Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] | Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. David Grosso [D] |
Cnc. Charles Allen [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-04 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-13 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-13 - Council - Amendment (Cheh) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-13 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-13 - Council - Amendment (Cheh) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-29 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is March 26, 2019 |
2019-01-25 | Council | Act A22-0567 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 923 |
2019-01-16 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0567 |
2019-01-16 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0567 |
2018-12-31 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 17, 2019 |
2018-12-04 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-11-13 | Council | First Reading |
2018-11-13 | Council | Amendment (Cheh) |
2018-10-10 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-09-25 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0507 |
2017-11-17 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2017-10-27 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-10-06 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0507 Published in the DC Register |
2017-10-03 | Council | Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment |
2017-10-03 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |