DC B22-0493 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-27 - Act A22-0167, Expires on January 21, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 10802
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-27 - Act A22-0167, Expires on January 21, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 10802
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Fiscal Year 2018 Budget Support Congressional Review Emergency Act Of 2017
Title
Fiscal Year 2018 Budget Support Congressional Review Emergency Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-10-03 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-27 | Council | Act A22-0167, Expires on January 21, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 10802 |
2017-10-24 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0167 |
2017-10-17 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2017-10-06 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on October 23, 2017 |
2017-10-03 | Council | Final Reading |
2017-10-03 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |