DC B22-0444 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - Law Number L22-0190 Effective from December 4, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - Law Number L22-0190 Effective from December 4, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Law 22-190 establishes a Public Housing Resident Bill of Rights to inform residents of some of their federal and District tenancy rights. It also requires the District of Columbia Housing Authority to publish a copy of the document online, and provide a hard copy of the document to each resident.
Title
Public Housing Resident Bill Of Rights Amendment Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-09-18 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-10 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-10 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-21 | Council | Law Number L22-0190 Effective from December 4, 2018 |
2018-10-19 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2018-10-19 | Council | Act A22-0472 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 11624 |
2018-10-15 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0472 |
2018-10-15 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0472 |
2018-10-01 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on October 16, 2018 |
2018-09-18 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-07-10 | Council | First Reading CC |
2018-07-03 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-07-02 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0444 |
2018-01-31 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-01-12 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-09-29 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0444 Published in the DC Register |
2017-09-19 | Council | Referred to Committee on Housing and Neighborhood Revitalization |
2017-09-19 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |