DC B22-0441 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-03 - Law Number L22-0113 Effective from July 3, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, this bill increases the rental unit fee to $30 from $25.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rental Unit Fee Adjustment Amendment Act Of 2017

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-10 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-03CouncilLaw Number L22-0113 Effective from July 3, 2018
2018-05-21CouncilTransmitted to Congress
2018-05-11CouncilAct A22-0318 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 5026
2018-05-03CouncilSigned with Act Number A22-0318
2018-05-03CouncilEnacted with Act Number A22-0318
2018-04-19CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on May 3, 2018
2018-04-10CouncilFinal Reading CC
2018-03-06CouncilFirst Reading CC
2018-02-27CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2018-02-23CouncilCommittee Mark-up of B22-0441
2017-12-18CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2017-12-01CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2017-09-29CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B22-0441 Published in the DC Register
2017-09-19CouncilReferred to Committee on Housing and Neighborhood Revitalization
2017-09-19CouncilIntroduced in Committee of the Whole

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback