DC B22-0399 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on July 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-18 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-18 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill requires the Department of Health to establish a program that provides baby boxes at the birth of a child at no-cost to parents who reside in the District and to provide education and training on safe sleeping arrangements for infants. The boxes shall be distributed by the Child and Family Services Agency.
Title
Infant Mortality Reduction Program Act Of 2017
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-18 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2017-08-04 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-07-21 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0399 Published in the DC Register |
2017-07-11 | Council | Referred to Committee on Health |
2017-07-11 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B22-0399 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/38581/B22-0399-Introduction.pdf |