DC B22-0382 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - Law Number L22-0058 Effective from February 15, 2018, Projected Law Date is February 10, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - Law Number L22-0058 Effective from February 15, 2018, Projected Law Date is February 10, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
This legislation authorizes the issuance of tax increment financing bonds to support infrastructure and retail parking pools for supplemental parking for a portion of the land located within the Union Market area.
FUNDING NOTE - This law was passed Subject to Appropriations. See Bill 22-754 for funding certification and Bill 22-753 for "Subject to Appropriations" repealer language
Title
Union Market Tax Increment Financing Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-12-05 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-07 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-07 - Council - Amendment (Silverman and Grosso) (Y: 2 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-11-07 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-07 - Council - Amendment (Silverman and Grosso) (Y: 2 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-16 | Council | Law Number L22-0058 Effective from February 15, 2018, Projected Law Date is February 10, 2018 |
2018-01-03 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is February 10, 2018 |
2017-12-29 | Council | Act A22-0218 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 13442 |
2017-12-20 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0218 |
2017-12-20 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0218 |
2017-12-13 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 28, 2017 |
2017-12-05 | Council | Final Reading |
2017-11-07 | Council | Amendment (Silverman and Grosso) |
2017-11-07 | Council | First Reading |
2017-10-11 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2017-10-11 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0382 |
2017-09-19 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2017-09-08 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-07-21 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-07-14 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0382 Published in the DC Register |
2017-07-11 | Council | Referred to Committee on Finance and Revenue |
2017-07-10 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |