DC B22-0326 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-09 - Act A22-0500 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 12331
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, this bill permits Advisory Neighborhood Commissions to obtain and use a purchase card, commonly known as a credit card, to make purchases on behalf of the commission in the same manner checking accounts and checks are currently authorized. The bill provides rules relating to how many and which members of the commission are required to authorize purchases.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Advisory Neighborhood Commissions Purchase Cards Amendment Act Of 2017

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-10-16 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-02 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-09CouncilAct A22-0500 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 12331
2018-10-31CouncilSigned with Act Number A22-0500
2018-10-31CouncilEnacted with Act Number A22-0500
2018-10-18CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on November 1, 2018
2018-10-16CouncilFinal Reading CC
2018-10-02CouncilFirst Reading CC
2018-09-26CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2018-09-24CouncilCommittee Mark-up of B22-0326
2017-11-30CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2017-08-04CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2017-06-23CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B22-0326 Published in the DC Register
2017-06-20CouncilReferred to Committee on Housing and Neighborhood Revitalization
2017-06-12CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback