DC B22-0318 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - Law Number L22-0059 Effective from February 17, 2018, Projected Law Date is February 14, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - Law Number L22-0059 Effective from February 17, 2018, Projected Law Date is February 14, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Law 22-59 establishes an Office on African American Affairs within District government to address the needs of the District's African American community. It will make policy recommendations, assist community organizations aiding the African American community, and issue grants that will assist African Americans.
Title
Office On African American Affairs Establishment Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-12-05 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-07 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-07 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-16 | Council | Law Number L22-0059 Effective from February 17, 2018, Projected Law Date is February 14, 2018 |
2018-01-05 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is February 14, 2018 |
2018-01-05 | Council | Act A22-0219 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 2 |
2017-12-28 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0219 |
2017-12-28 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0219 |
2017-12-13 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 28, 2017 |
2017-12-05 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2017-11-07 | Council | First Reading CC |
2017-10-03 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2017-09-28 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0318 |
2017-07-06 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2017-06-16 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-06-09 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0318 Published in the DC Register |
2017-06-06 | Council | Referred to Committee on Government Operations |
2017-06-06 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |