DC B22-0313 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on January 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-29 - Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is March 26, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on January 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-29 - Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is March 26, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill makes changes to nutrition and wellness policies in District Schools. It makes changes to nutrition-content requirements; expands breakfast after the bell and alternate serving models for breakfast participation programs; encourages schools to purchase food in a manner consistent with the Good Food Purchasing Program's core values; requires OSSE to submit a report to the Mayor and Council regarding best practices for developing a central kitchen; and requires that public and charter school students participate in specified amounts of age-appropriate physical education per week.
FUNDING NOTE - This law is Subject to Appropriations. See Fiscal Impact Statement in "Other Documents" tab.
Title
Healthy Students Amendment Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] | Cnc. Trayon White [D] |
Cnc. Brandon Todd [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Kenyan McDuffie [D] | Cnc. Jack Evans [D] |
Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-04 - Council - Amendment (Cheh) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-13 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-13 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-29 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is March 26, 2019 |
2019-01-25 | Council | Act A22-0566 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 912 |
2019-01-16 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0566 |
2019-01-16 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0566 |
2018-12-31 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 17, 2019 |
2018-12-04 | Council | Final Reading |
2018-12-04 | Council | Amendment (Cheh) |
2018-11-13 | Council | First Reading CC |
2018-11-01 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-10-25 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0313 |
2017-11-16 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2017-10-27 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-08-04 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-07-21 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-06-09 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0313 Published in the DC Register |
2017-06-06 | Council | Referred to Committee on Education |
2017-06-06 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |