DC B22-0280 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - Law Number L22-0055 Effective from February 15, 2018, Projected Law Date is February 10, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - Law Number L22-0055 Effective from February 15, 2018, Projected Law Date is February 10, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Law 22-55 closes an alley in Ward 6. The alley is located in Square 772 bounded by M Street, N Street, 3rd Street, Florida Avenue, and 4th Street.
Title
Closing Of A Public Alley In Square 772, S.o. 16-25615, Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-12-05 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-07 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-07 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-16 | Council | Law Number L22-0055 Effective from February 15, 2018, Projected Law Date is February 10, 2018 |
2018-01-03 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is February 10, 2018 |
2017-12-29 | Council | Act A22-0214 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 13434 |
2017-12-20 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0214 |
2017-12-20 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0214 |
2017-12-11 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 26, 2017 |
2017-12-05 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2017-11-07 | Council | First Reading CC |
2017-11-06 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2017-10-17 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0280 |
2017-09-28 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2017-09-22 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-09-01 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-05-16 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2017-05-12 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0280 Published in the DC Register |
2017-05-08 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |