DC B22-0228 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on January 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-30 - Signed with Act Number A22-0613
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on January 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-30 - Signed with Act Number A22-0613
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill requires that the Department of Health install drop boxes for the disposal of expired or unused controlled substances at law enforcement agencies, retail pharmacies and hospitals with an on-site pharmacy. It identifies which controlled substances a person may voluntarily surrender without identifying themselves.
FUNDING NOTE - This law is Subject to Appropriations. See Fiscal Impact Statement in "Other Documents" tab.
Title
Safe Disposal Of Pharmaceuticals Amendment Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. David Grosso [D] | Cnc. Jack Evans [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] |
Cnc. Kenyan McDuffie [D] | Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] | Cnc. Phil Mendelson [D] | Cnc. Charles Allen [D] |
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-18 - Council - Amendment (Nadeau) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-18 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-18 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-30 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0613 |
2019-01-30 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0613 |
2019-01-15 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 30, 2019 |
2018-12-18 | Council | Final Reading |
2018-12-18 | Council | Amendment (Nadeau) |
2018-12-04 | Council | First Reading CC |
2018-11-29 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-11-19 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0228 |
2017-09-18 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2017-08-04 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-04-07 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0228 Published in the DC Register |
2017-04-04 | Council | Referred to Committee on Health |
2017-04-04 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |