DC B22-0201 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-25 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-25 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced it establishes a pilot program within the Department of Health, in cooperation with the Board of Pharmacy, for the donation and redistribution of certain unused prescription medications to low-income District of Columbia residents. Under the pilot program, any person, prescription drug manufacturer or distributor, pharmacy, health care provider or health care facility may donate their own drugs on the premises of a participating medical facility or pharmacy.
Title
Prescription Drug Donation Pilot Program Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Cnc. Brandon Todd [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. Jack Evans [D] | Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] |
Cnc. Kenyan McDuffie [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-25 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2017-10-20 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-08-04 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-03-24 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0201 Published in the DC Register |
2017-03-21 | Council | Referred to Committee on Health |
2017-03-21 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B22-0201 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/37702/B22-0201-Introduction.pdf |