DC B22-0195 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Law Number L22-0141 Effective from July 17, 2018, Projected Law Date is July 14, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Law Number L22-0141 Effective from July 17, 2018, Projected Law Date is July 14, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced it requires the Department of Behavioral Health to conduct a study to evaluate the impact of the threat of action by the federal government to remove immigrant residents from the District on the mental health and substance abuse of communities of immigrant populations. The study shall review if there is a relationship of mental trauma and fear of removal. It shall also evaluate access to and the use of mental health services for immigrant populations where English is not the primary language.
FUNDING NOTE - This law is Subject to Appropriations.
Title
Study Of Mental Health And Substance Abuse In Immigrant Communities Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-01 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-10 | Council | Law Number L22-0141 Effective from July 17, 2018, Projected Law Date is July 14, 2018 |
2018-06-04 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is July 14, 2018 |
2018-06-01 | Council | Act A22-0368 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 5973 |
2018-05-21 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0368 |
2018-05-21 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0368 |
2018-05-11 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on May 25, 2018 |
2018-05-01 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-04-10 | Council | First Reading CC |
2018-03-15 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-03-14 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0195 |
2017-11-15 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2017-10-20 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-08-04 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-03-24 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0195 Published in the DC Register |
2017-03-21 | Council | Referred to Committee on Health |
2017-03-21 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |