DC B22-0170 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on October 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is February 26, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on October 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is February 26, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill authorizes the Office of the Attorney General to enforce the Consumer Protection Procedures Act against housing providers that violate laws that protect tenants.
Title
At-risk Tenant Protection Clarifying Amendment Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] |
Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. Kenyan McDuffie [D] | Cnc. Phil Mendelson [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-10-16 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-02 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-02 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is February 26, 2019 |
2018-11-09 | Council | Act A22-0505 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 12363 |
2018-10-31 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0505 |
2018-10-31 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0505 |
2018-10-23 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on November 6, 2018 |
2018-10-16 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-10-02 | Council | First Reading CC |
2018-09-21 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-09-20 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0170 |
2017-09-21 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2017-09-01 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-03-10 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0170 Published in the DC Register |
2017-03-07 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2017-03-07 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |