DC B22-0168 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on September 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-28 - Law Number L22-0154 Effective from August 22, 2018, Projected Law Date is August 22, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on September 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-28 - Law Number L22-0154 Effective from August 22, 2018, Projected Law Date is August 22, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Law 22-154 establishes a pilot program that will allow residents in certain public housing properties to volunteer to have the timeliness of their rent payment reported to one or more of the major credit bureaus. The Housing Authority must submit a report to the Council regarding the pilot program no later than 3 months after completion of the 12 month implementation period.
FUNDING NOTE - This law is Subject to Appropriations. See Fiscal Impact Statement in "Other Documents" tab.
Title
Public Housing Credit Building Pilot Program Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] | Cnc. Brandon Todd [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] |
Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] | Cnc. Phil Mendelson [D] | Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. Trayon White [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-05 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-28 | Council | Law Number L22-0154 Effective from August 22, 2018, Projected Law Date is August 22, 2018 |
2018-07-11 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is August 22, 2018 |
2018-07-06 | Council | Act A22-0392 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 7146 |
2018-06-27 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0392 |
2018-06-27 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0392 |
2018-06-14 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on June 28, 2018 |
2018-06-05 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-05-01 | Council | First Reading CC |
2018-04-25 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-04-25 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0168 |
2018-01-31 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-01-12 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-03-10 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0168 Published in the DC Register |
2017-03-07 | Council | Referred to Committee on Housing and Neighborhood Revitalization |
2017-03-07 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |