DC B22-0112 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is February 26, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is February 26, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill authorizes the Mayor to execute an Interstate Insurance Product Regulation Compact to protect the interest of consumers of individual and group annuity, life insurance, disability income and long-term care insurance products. The Compact shall develop uniform standards for insurance products covered by the Compact and among other things, create an Interstate Insurance Product Regulation Commission. A compacting state includes any State which has enacted the legislation and has not withdrawn or been terminated.
Title
Interstate Insurance Product Regulation Compact Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-10-16 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-02 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-02 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is February 26, 2019 |
2018-11-23 | Council | Act A22-0514 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 12933 |
2018-11-13 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0514 |
2018-11-13 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0514 |
2018-10-29 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on November 13, 2018 |
2018-10-16 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-10-02 | Council | First Reading CC |
2018-09-26 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-09-25 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0112 |
2018-01-31 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-01-12 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-02-10 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0112 Published in the DC Register |
2017-02-07 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2017-02-07 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |