DC B22-0076 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-06 - Committee Report Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-06 - Committee Report Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill requires the Mayor to designate 10,300 square feet of space within District buildings and adjacent areas to meet childcare needs. District residents who are assigned to work within the building or adjacent area are to receive first priority for childcare availability at those sites. The bill also requires OSSE to determine whether existing child development facilities are eligible to provide childcare in District buildings or adjacent area and to develop a policy manual for child development facilities seeking to provide childcare in District buildings or adjacent areas. It also includes provisions pertaining to the physical space and service capabilities of the facilities, the process by which leases shall be awarded to eligible child development facilities, and the liability of the District government for incidents within the facilities.
Title
District Of Columbia Child Development Facilities Expansion Amendment Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Cnc. David Grosso [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] |
Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-06 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2017-10-31 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0076 |
2017-03-30 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2017-02-24 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-01-27 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0076 Published in the DC Register |
2017-01-24 | Council | Referred to Committee on Education |
2017-01-24 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B22-0076 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/37277/B22-0076-Introduction.pdf |