DC B22-0029 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on October 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-13 - Law Number L22-0021 Effective from September 23, 2017, Projected Law Date is September 21, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on October 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-13 - Law Number L22-0021 Effective from September 23, 2017, Projected Law Date is September 21, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Law 22-21 concerns water quality at District public and charter schools and child development centers. It requires the Department of General Services (DGS) to locate, test, label, install filters, and place specified signage on each water source at District public schools. The law also specifies a process for charter schools and child development facilities to test and maintain the quality of water sources with District involvement. The Mayor is authorized to create implementing rules, issue civil sanctions, and enter charter schools and child development facilities to ascertain compliance with the provisions of the law. In some instances, if entry is denied, the Mayor may obtain a search warrant from the Superior Court.
FUNDING NOTE - This bill was passed Subject to Appropriations. It was partially funded by Bill 22-242 and Bill 22-754; Other provisions remain Subject to Appropriations.
Title
Childhood Lead Exposure Prevention Amendment Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-11 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson, Grosso) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Council - Amendment (Cheh) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Council - Amendment (Cheh) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-13 | Council | Law Number L22-0021 Effective from September 23, 2017, Projected Law Date is September 21, 2017 |
2017-08-11 | Council | Act A22-0125 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 7631 |
2017-08-10 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is September 21, 2017 |
2017-07-31 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0125 |
2017-07-31 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0125 |
2017-07-19 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on August 2, 2017 |
2017-07-11 | Council | Final Reading |
2017-07-11 | Council | Amendment (Mendelson, Grosso) |
2017-06-27 | Council | First Reading |
2017-06-27 | Council | Amendment (Cheh) |
2017-06-14 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2017-06-14 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0029 |
2017-01-13 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0029 Published in the DC Register |
2017-01-10 | Council | Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment |
2017-01-10 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |