DC B22-0023 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-19 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-19 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill requires the Department of Housing and Community Development give priority consideration to certain developers regarding contracts that include equity and development participation of local, small, or certified business enterprises.
Title
Local And Small Business Equity And Development Participation Amendment Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Cnc. Kenyan McDuffie [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. Trayon White [D] |
Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-19 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2017-08-18 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-08-11 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-06-19 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2017-05-26 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-01-13 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0023 Published in the DC Register |
2017-01-10 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2017-01-10 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B22-0023 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/37179/B22-0023-Introduction.pdf |