DC B22-0015 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-11 - Act A22-0535 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 183
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-11 - Act A22-0535 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 183
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill orders the closing of a portion of a public alley in Ward 6, located at the intersection of N Street Southwest, Half Street Southwest, O Street Southwest, and South Capitol Street Southwest.
Title
Closing Of A Public Alley In Square 653, S.o. 15-26384, Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-04 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-13 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-13 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-11 | Council | Act A22-0535 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 183 |
2019-01-09 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is February 26, 2019 |
2018-12-26 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0535 |
2018-12-26 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0535 |
2018-12-13 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 28, 2018 |
2018-12-04 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-11-16 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-11-13 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0015 |
2018-11-13 | Council | First Reading CC |
2017-03-30 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2017-03-10 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-01-24 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2017-01-13 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0015 Published in the DC Register |
2017-01-09 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |