DC B22-0013 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Law Number L22-0077 Effective from March 29, 2018, Projected Law Date is March 28, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Law Number L22-0077 Effective from March 29, 2018, Projected Law Date is March 28, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
This legislation clarifies which accident and traffic data the Mayor will report to the Council and when an all-terrain vehicle or dirt bike may occupy public space in the District. The legislation also specifies that the presence of workers is unnecessary for a moving violation to double. It establishes criminal penalties for violating the Ignition Interlock System Program. It also clarifies established penalties for 3 time offenders of certain driving offenses within a five year period.
Title
Bicycle And Pedestrian Safety Technical Amendment Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-09 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-05 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-05 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Council | Law Number L22-0077 Effective from March 29, 2018, Projected Law Date is March 28, 2018 |
2018-02-16 | Council | Act A22-0248 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 1555 |
2018-02-14 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is March 28, 2018 |
2018-02-06 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0248 |
2018-02-06 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0248 |
2018-01-23 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on February 6, 2018 |
2018-01-09 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2017-12-05 | Council | First Reading CC |
2017-11-29 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2017-11-29 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0013 |
2017-06-21 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2017-06-09 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-05-26 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-01-13 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0013 Published in the DC Register |
2017-01-10 | Council | Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment |
2017-01-06 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |