DC B21-0833 | 2015-2016 | 21st Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-06 - Signed with Act Number A21-0604
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-06 - Signed with Act Number A21-0604
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill prohibits the advertisement, packaging, or labeling of any nonwoven disposable product as flushable, sewer safe, or septic safe unless the claim is substantiated by competent and reliable scientific evidence. The bill authorizes the Department of Energy and Environment (DDOE) to impose civil fines and penalties to sanction non-compliance with its provisions. DDOE is also authorized to seek injunctive relief or other appropriate remedies in any court of competent jurisdiction to enforce compliance.
Title
Nonwoven Disposable Products Act Of 2016
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-12-06 - Council - Amendment (Cheh) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-06 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-15 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-06 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-15 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-06 | Council | Signed with Act Number A21-0604 |
2017-01-06 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A21-0604 |
2016-12-23 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 10, 2017 |
2016-12-06 | Council | Final Reading |
2016-12-06 | Council | Amendment (Cheh) |
2016-11-15 | Council | First Reading CC |
2016-11-08 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2016-11-07 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B21-0833 |
2016-10-24 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2016-10-07 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2016-07-15 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B21-0833 Published in the DC Register |
2016-07-12 | Council | Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment |
2016-07-12 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |