DC B21-0759 | 2015-2016 | 21st Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-06 - Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is February 28, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-06 - Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is February 28, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill requires the Mayor to issue a motor vehicle identification tag with a bicycle awareness design. The image and wording on the tag will educate motorists on the 3-foot overtaking and bypassing a bicycle rule. The bill establishes application and display fee amounts, and authorizes the Mayor to establish other amounts by rule. Fees obtained from application and display fees shall be deposited into the Vision Zero Pedestrian and Bicycle State Fund.
Title
Bicycle Awareness Motor Vehicle License Plate Amendment Act Of 2016
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-11-15 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-01 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-01 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-06 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is February 28, 2017 |
2016-12-16 | Council | Act A21-0569 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 15326 |
2016-12-07 | Council | Signed with Act Number A21-0569 |
2016-12-07 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A21-0569 |
2016-11-23 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 8, 2016 |
2016-11-15 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2016-11-01 | Council | First Reading CC |
2016-10-26 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2016-10-25 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B21-0759 |
2016-09-19 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2016-09-02 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2016-06-07 | Council | Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment |
2016-05-27 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B21-0759 Published in the DC Register |
2016-05-20 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |