DC B21-0683 | 2015-2016 | 21st Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on December 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-06 - Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is April 12, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on December 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-06 - Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is April 12, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill makes changes to District law regarding detainment of minors. It redefines the term "child" to include more persons and prohibits the following: (1) the placement of children into detention facilities prior to a fact-finding or dispositional hearing solely because they have been declared to be in need of supervision; (2) the placement of individuals under the age of 18 into adult penal institutions; (3) and the transfer of legal custody from parents or guardians to a government entity after a finding of delinquency as relating to a child under the age of ten. The bill also includes provisions eliminating the legal presumption that detention is required in certain circumstances; authorizes certain persons to view ordinarily confidential juvenile records; requires the Attorney General to develop a program to provide victim-offender mediation as an alternative to prosecution if both parties agree; and requires the Department of Youth Rehabilitation to conduct and submit an annual analysis to the Council on root causes of youth incarceration.
This legislation is Subject to Appropriations. See Fiscal Impact Statement under "Other Documents" tab.
Title
Comprehensive Youth Justice Amendment Act Of 2016
Sponsors
Cnc. Kenyan McDuffie [D] | Cnc. David Grosso [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] |
Cnc. LaRuby May [D] | Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] | Cnc. Phil Mendelson [D] | Cnc. Charles Allen [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-11-01 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-01 - Council - Amendment (McDuffie) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-11 - Council - Amendments #1 thru #3 (McDuffie) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-11 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-01 - Council - Amendment (McDuffie) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-11 - Council - Amendments #1 thru #3 (McDuffie) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-11 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-06 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is April 12, 2017 |
2016-12-16 | Council | Act A21-0568 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 15312 |
2016-12-07 | Council | Signed with Act Number A21-0568 |
2016-12-07 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A21-0568 |
2016-11-23 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 8, 2016 |
2016-11-01 | Council | Final Reading |
2016-11-01 | Council | Amendment (McDuffie) |
2016-10-11 | Council | Amendments #1 thru #3 (McDuffie) |
2016-10-11 | Council | First Reading |
2016-10-05 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2016-10-05 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B21-0683 |
2016-06-02 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2016-06-02 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2016-04-15 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2016-04-15 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2016-04-08 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B21-0683 Published in the DC Register |
2016-04-05 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-04-05 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |