DC B21-0615 | 2015-2016 | 21st Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on January 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-06 - Signed with Act Number A21-0597
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on January 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-06 - Signed with Act Number A21-0597
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill establishes a program in the Office of Unified Communications (OUC), the Emergency Medical Information Profile Program. It includes provisions that require OUC to establish and administer the emergency medical information profile program, provide decals for participants to affix to motor vehicles or homes, and collaborate with the Department of Motor Vehicles to develop and disseminate an emergency medical information profile request form.
Title
Notice In Case Of Emergency Amendment Act Of 2016
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-12-06 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-15 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-15 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-06 | Council | Signed with Act Number A21-0597 |
2017-01-06 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A21-0597 |
2016-12-23 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 10, 2017 |
2016-12-06 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2016-11-15 | Council | First Reading CC |
2016-11-09 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2016-11-09 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B21-0615 |
2016-03-22 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2016-03-11 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2016-03-04 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2016-02-19 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B21-0615 Published in the DC Register |
2016-02-16 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-02-16 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |