DC B21-0509 | 2015-2016 | 21st Council
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on December 1 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-16 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 1 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-16 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill abolishes the Office of Campaign Finance and establishes an office within the Board of Ethics and Government Accountability called the Citizens Fair Election Oversight Office in its place. After each regularly scheduled general election, the Oversight Office shall conduct a review of the elections financing program. The Oversight Office is charged with providing adjustments to the maximum and base amount of certain campaign contributions. The bill also establishes guidelines regarding: benefits for participating candidates, allocations from the Elections Fund, matching payments for qualified small dollar contributions, eligibility and certification of candidates, as well as for contribution, expenditure, and fundraising requirements. Among other things, it also establishes a minimum number of debates that each candidate is required to participate in.
Title
Citizens Fair Election Program Amendment Act Of 2015
Sponsors
Cnc. David Grosso [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Charles Allen [D] |
Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] | Cnc. Phil Mendelson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-16 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2016-10-21 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2015-12-04 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B21-0509 Published in the DC Register |
2015-12-01 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-12-01 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B21-0509 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/34949/B21-0509-Introduction.pdf |