DC B20-1048 | 2013-2014 | 20th Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on December 30 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-06 - Retained by the Council
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Business Improvement Districts Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act Of 2014

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Business Improvement Districts Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act Of 2014

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-12-17 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-01-06CouncilRetained by the Council
2014-12-30CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Jan 14, 2015
2014-12-17CouncilFinal Reading CC
2014-12-16CouncilB20-1048 Introduced by Councilmember Orange at Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback