DC B20-1030 | 2013-2014 | 20th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on December 30 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-30 - Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Jan 14, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on December 30 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-30 - Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Jan 14, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Georgia Avenue Great Streets Neighborhood Retail Priority Area Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act Of 2014
Title
Georgia Avenue Great Streets Neighborhood Retail Priority Area Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act Of 2014
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-17 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-30 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Jan 14, 2015 |
2014-12-17 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2014-12-16 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2014-12-11 | Council | B20-1030 Introduced by Councilmember Bowser at Office of the Secretary |