DC B20-0886 | 2013-2014 | 20th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-12 - Act A20-0501 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 12587
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-12 - Act A20-0501 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 12587
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Paint Stewardship Act Of 2014
Title
Paint Stewardship Act Of 2014
Sponsors
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Tommy Wells [D] | Cnc. Muriel Bowser [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-11-18 - Council - Second Reconsideration (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-18 - Council - First Reconsideration (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-18 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-28 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-28 - Council - Amendment (Cheh) - Accepted as friendly (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-18 - Council - First Reconsideration (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-18 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-28 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-28 - Council - Amendment (Cheh) - Accepted as friendly (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-12 | Council | Act A20-0501 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 12587 |
2014-12-09 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2014-12-08 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A20-0501 |
2014-11-28 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Dec 12, 2014 |
2014-11-18 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2014-10-28 | Council | Amendment (Cheh) |
2014-10-15 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B20-0886 |
2014-09-19 | Council | Public Hearing on B20-0886 |
2014-08-15 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register |
2014-07-25 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B20-0886 Published in the District of Columbia Register |
2014-07-14 | Council | B20-0886 Introduced by Councilmember Cheh at Legislative Meeting |