DC B20-0846 | 2013-2014 | 20th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - Law Number L20-0146 Effective from Dec 17, 2014, Expires on Jul 30, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - Law Number L20-0146 Effective from Dec 17, 2014, Expires on Jul 30, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Nationwide Mortgage Licensing System Conformity Temporary Act Of 2014
Title
Nationwide Mortgage Licensing System Conformity Temporary Act Of 2014
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-07-14 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-17 | Council | Law Number L20-0146 Effective from Dec 17, 2014, Expires on Jul 30, 2015 |
2014-09-08 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is Dec 17, 2014 |
2014-08-08 | Council | Act A20-0389 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 8063 |
2014-07-31 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2014-07-29 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A20-0389 |
2014-07-23 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Aug 6, 2014 |
2014-07-14 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2014-06-24 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2014-06-19 | Council | B20-0846 Introduced by Councilmember Orange at Office of the Secretary |