DC B20-0723 | 2013-2014 | 20th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on November 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-05 - Act A20-0486 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 12411
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on November 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-05 - Act A20-0486 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 12411
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Special Education Student Rights Act Of 2014
Title
Special Education Student Rights Act Of 2014
Sponsors
Cnc. David Catania [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. David Grosso [D] |
Cnc. Kenyan McDuffie [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-10-28 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-07 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-07 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of Substitute (Catania) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-07 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-07 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of Substitute (Catania) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-05 | Council | Act A20-0486 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 12411 |
2014-11-24 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2014-11-20 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A20-0486 |
2014-11-13 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Nov 28, 2014 |
2014-10-28 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2014-10-07 | Council | Amendment in the Nature of Substitute (Catania) |
2014-07-15 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2014-07-10 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B20-0723 |
2014-06-19 | Council | Public Hearing on B20-0723 |
2014-04-04 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register |
2014-03-21 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B20-0723 Published in the District of Columbia Register |
2014-03-18 | Council | B20-0723 Introduced by Councilmember Catania at Committee of the Whole |