DC B20-0642 | 2013-2014 | 20th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on August 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - Law Number L20-0152 Effective from Dec 17, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on August 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - Law Number L20-0152 Effective from Dec 17, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Fair Criminal Record Screening Act Of 2014
Title
Fair Criminal Record Screening Act Of 2014
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-07-14 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-07-14 - Council - Amendment (McDuffie) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-03 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-03 - Council - Amendment #2 (Mendelson) - Accepted as a friendly (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-03 - Council - Amendment #1 (McDuffie and Bowser) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-07-14 - Council - Amendment (McDuffie) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-03 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-03 - Council - Amendment #2 (Mendelson) - Accepted as a friendly (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-03 - Council - Amendment #1 (McDuffie and Bowser) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-17 | Council | Law Number L20-0152 Effective from Dec 17, 2014 |
2014-09-08 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is Dec 17, 2014 |
2014-08-29 | Council | Act A20-0422 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 8904 |
2014-08-22 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2014-08-21 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A20-0422 |
2014-08-08 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Aug 22, 2014 |
2014-07-14 | Council | Amendment (McDuffie) |
2014-06-03 | Council | Amendment #1 (McDuffie and Bowser) |
2014-05-28 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B20-0642 |
2014-02-10 | Council | Public Hearing on B20-0642 |
2014-01-24 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register |
2014-01-10 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B20-0642 Published in the District of Columbia Register |
2014-01-07 | Council | B20-0642 Introduced by Councilmembers Wells, Barry, McDuffie, Orange, Graham, Bowser, and Bonds, and Chairman Mendelson at Legislative Meeting |