DC B20-0603 | 2013-2014 | 20th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on December 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-17 - Final Reading CC
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-17 - Final Reading CC
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sonia Gutierrez Way Designation Act Of 2013
Title
Sonia Gutierrez Way Designation Act Of 2013
Sponsors
Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Kenyan McDuffie [D] | Cnc. Muriel Bowser [D] | Cnc. Jim Graham [D] |
Cnc. Vincent Orange [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-12-17 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-02 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-02 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-17 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2014-12-12 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2014-12-02 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B20-0603 |
2014-11-13 | Council | Public Hearing on B20-0603 |
2014-10-24 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register |
2013-12-06 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B20-0603 Published in the District of Columbia Register |
2013-12-03 | Council | B20-0603 Introduced by Councilmembers Bonds and McDuffie at Legislative Meeting |