DC B20-0594 | 2013-2014 | 20th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on November 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-05 - Act A20-0485 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 12407
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on November 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-05 - Act A20-0485 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 12407
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Disposition Of District Land For Affordable Housing Amendment Act Of 2013
Title
Disposition Of District Land For Affordable Housing Amendment Act Of 2013
Sponsors
Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Muriel Bowser [D] | Cnc. Jim Graham [D] | Cnc. Kenyan McDuffie [D] |
Cnc. Yvette Alexander [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. David Grosso [D] | Cnc. Vincent Orange [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-10-28 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-28 - Council - Amendment #2 (McDuffie) - Accepted as friendly (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-28 - Council - Amendment #1 (Mendelson) - Accepted as friendly (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-07 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-28 - Council - Amendment #2 (McDuffie) - Accepted as friendly (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-28 - Council - Amendment #1 (Mendelson) - Accepted as friendly (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-07 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-05 | Council | Act A20-0485 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 12407 |
2014-11-27 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A20-0485 |
2014-11-24 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2014-11-12 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Nov 26, 2014 |
2014-10-28 | Council | Amendment #1 (Mendelson) - Accepted as friendly |
2014-10-07 | Council | First Reading |
2014-07-09 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2014-07-08 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B20-0594 |
2014-05-29 | Council | Public Hearing on B20-0594 |
2014-04-25 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register |
2013-12-06 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B20-0594 Published in the District of Columbia Register |
2013-12-03 | Council | B20-0594 Introduced by Councilmembers Bonds, Bowser, Graham, and McDuffie at Legislative Meeting |