DC B20-0539 | 2013-2014 | 20th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-12 - Act A20-0494 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 12563
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-12 - Act A20-0494 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 12563
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
St. Matthews Evangelical Lutheran Church Community Garden Equitable Real Property Tax Relief Act Of 2013
Title
St. Matthews Evangelical Lutheran Church Community Garden Equitable Real Property Tax Relief Act Of 2013
Sponsors
Cnc. Tommy Wells [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-11-18 - Council - Second Reconsideration (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-18 - Council - First Reconsideration (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-18 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-28 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-18 - Council - First Reconsideration (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-18 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-28 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-12 | Council | Act A20-0494 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 12563 |
2014-12-09 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2014-12-08 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A20-0494 |
2014-11-28 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Dec 12, 2014 |
2014-11-18 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2014-10-28 | Council | First Reading |
2014-10-23 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B20-0539 |
2014-10-16 | Council | Public Hearing on B20-0539 |
2014-09-26 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register |
2013-11-05 | Council | Referred to Committee on Finance and Revenue |
2013-11-01 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B20-0539 Published in the District of Columbia Register |
2013-10-22 | Council | B20-0539 Introduced by Councilmember Wells at Office of the Secretary |