DC B20-0289 | 2013-2014 | 20th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 18 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-02 - Amendment (Alexander)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 18 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-02 - Amendment (Alexander)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Clinical Laboratory Practitioners Amendment Act Of 2013
Title
Clinical Laboratory Practitioners Amendment Act Of 2013
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-02 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-02 - Council - Amendment (Alexander) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-18 - Council - Second Reconsideration (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-18 - Council - First Reconsideration (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-18 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-02 - Council - Amendment (Alexander) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-18 - Council - Second Reconsideration (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-18 - Council - First Reconsideration (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-18 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-02 | Council | Amendment (Alexander) |
2014-11-18 | Council | First Reading CC |
2014-11-12 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B20-0289 |
2014-06-25 | Council | Public Hearing on B20-0289 |
2014-06-06 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register |
2013-06-07 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B20-0289 Published in the District of Columbia Register |
2013-06-04 | Council | Referred to Committee on Health |
2013-05-29 | Council | B20-0289 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary |