DC B20-0081 | 2013-2014 | 20th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-29 - Returned from Mayor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-29 - Returned from Mayor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Trash Compactor Tax Incentive Act Of 2013
Title
Trash Compactor Tax Incentive Act Of 2013
Sponsors
Cnc. Jack Evans [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-12-02 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-18 - Council - Second Reconsideration (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-18 - Council - First Consideration (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-18 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-18 - Council - Second Reconsideration (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-18 - Council - First Consideration (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-18 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-29 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2014-12-23 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A20-0538 |
2014-12-16 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Dec 31, 2014 |
2014-12-02 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2014-11-18 | Council | First Reading CC |
2014-11-13 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B20-0081 |
2013-10-09 | Council | Public Hearing on B20-0081 |
2013-09-20 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register |
2013-02-05 | Council | Referred to Committee on Finance and Revenue |
2013-01-25 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B20-0081 Published in the District of Columbia Register |
2013-01-24 | Council | B20-0081 Introduced by Councilmember Evans at Office of the Secretary |