CT SR00012 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Adopted, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Adopted, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution Proposing Approval Of An Agreement Between The State Of Connecticut And The State Employees Bargaining Agent Coalition (sebac).
Title
Resolution Proposing Approval Of An Agreement Between The State Of Connecticut And The State Employees Bargaining Agent Coalition (sebac).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 108 (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-12 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Senate) (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-12 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Senate) (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Senate | Adopted, Senate |
2024-04-12 | Senate | File Number 466 |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 273 |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/24 5:00 PM |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Senate Favorable |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Public Hearing 04/12 |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Filed with Senate Clerks |