CT SR00009 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Adopted, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Adopted, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution Proposing Approval Of A Tentative Agreement Between The State Of Connecticut And The Connecticut State Employees Association (p-3b Bargaining Unit).
Title
Resolution Proposing Approval Of A Tentative Agreement Between The State Of Connecticut And The Connecticut State Employees Association (p-3b Bargaining Unit).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 328 (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Senate) (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Senate) (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-04 | Senate | Adopted, Senate |
2021-05-25 | Senate | File Number 720 |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 480 |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/24/21 5:00 PM |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Senate Favorable |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Public Hearing 05/17 |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Filed with Senate Clerks |