CT SJ00055 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of Ira Bloom Of Greenwich To Be A Member Of The Board Of Regents For Higher Education.
Title
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of Ira Bloom Of Greenwich To Be A Member Of The Board Of Regents For Higher Education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 223 (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - Joint - EXN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - Joint - EXN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-02 | House | In Concurrence |
2022-05-02 | House | Adopted, House |
2022-04-29 | House | House Calendar Number 515 |
2022-04-29 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-29 | House | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the House |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Adopted, Senate |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 376 |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Public Hearing 04/12 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Nomination Referred to Committee on Executive and Legislative Nominations |