CT SJ00044 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on April 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-03 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-03 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of Matthew Edward Auger, Esquire, Of Groton To Be Judge Of The Superior Court.
Title
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of Matthew Edward Auger, Esquire, Of Groton To Be Judge Of The Superior Court.
Sponsors
Sen. John Kissel [R] | Sen. Paul Doyle [D] | Rep. William Tong [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 182 (Y: 77 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 105 ADOPT (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 117 ADOPT (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 37 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 105 ADOPT (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 117 ADOPT (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 37 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | House | In Concurrence |
2018-05-03 | House | Adopted, House |
2018-05-01 | House | House Calendar Number 468 |
2018-05-01 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-05-01 | House | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the House |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Adopted, Senate |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 399 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Public Hearing 04/23 |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Nomination Referred to Committee on Judiciary |