CT SJ00040 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-24 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-24 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of Laura Cordes Of West Hartford To Be Reappointed A Member Of The Connecticut Commuter Rail Council.
Title
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of Laura Cordes Of West Hartford To Be Reappointed A Member Of The Connecticut Commuter Rail Council.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 75 ADOPT (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 77 ADOPT (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Joint - EXN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 77 ADOPT (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Joint - EXN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Adopted, House |
2018-04-19 | Senate | House Calendar Number 413 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-18 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Adopted, Senate |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 312 |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Public Hearing 04/12 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Nomination Referred to Committee on Executive and Legislative Nominations |