CT SJ00031 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-07 - House Recommitted to Government Administration and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-07 - House Recommitted to Government Administration and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Resolution Proposing A State Constitutional Amendment To Allow Early Voting.
Title
Resolution Proposing A State Constitutional Amendment To Allow Early Voting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-23 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (House) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-23 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Senate) (Y: 2 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-23 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Senate) (Y: 2 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-07 | Senate | House Recommitted to Government Administration and Elections |
2018-04-10 | Senate | File Number 412 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | House Calendar Number 261 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Report, House Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-23 | Senate | House Favorable |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Motion Failed (SF) |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/15 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |