CT SJ00026 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-27 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-27 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of David Jimenez Of Hartford To Be A Member Of The Board Of Regents For Higher Education.
Title
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of David Jimenez Of Hartford To Be A Member Of The Board Of Regents For Higher Education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 21 ADOPT (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Joint - EXN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Joint - EXN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Adopted, House |
2019-03-14 | Senate | House Calendar Number 51 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Adopted, Senate |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 35 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/0519 |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Nomination Referred to Committee on Executive and Legislative Nominations |